Feniak, Jason David (CPSO#: 90736)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2013