Fera, Evridiki Vicky (CPSO#: 94195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek, Spanish

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 University Avenue
Suite 1200
Toronto ON  M5G 2L3
Phone: 416-813-7500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7600
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018


Corporation Name: E. Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fera ( CPSO# 94195 )

Business Address:
Suite 1200
525 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2L3
Phone Number: (416) 617-6864

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVRIDIKI VICKY FERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012