Fergani, Houssein R (CPSO#: 76904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X8
Phone: (905) 297-8434
Fax: (905) 296-0050
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Houssein Fergani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fergani ( CPSO# 76904 )

Business Address:
40 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X8
Phone Number: (905) 297-8434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOUSSEIN R FERGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Aug 2001 to 02 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002