Ferguson, Brian William (CPSO#: 91441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
Suite A
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: (226) 440-3555
Fax: (226) 440-3544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian W. Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferguson ( CPSO# 91441 )

Business Address:
Unit 4 Suite A
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (226) 440-3555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)