Ferguson, Charles Brendan (CPSO#: 92217)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010