Ferguson, Kimberley Adele (CPSO#: 76506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5424
Fax: (844) 847-8841
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K A Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ADELE FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003