Ferguson, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
610 University Avenue M 700
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferguson ( CPSO# 71125 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
M700 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2254

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006