Ferguson, Sarah Helen (CPSO#: 78568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferguson ( CPSO# 78568 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
Georgetown Hospital (Georgetown)
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH HELEN FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009