Fernandes, David Philip (CPSO#: 77587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fernandes ( CPSO# 77587 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
202 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004