Fernandes, Nicole Dominica (CPSO#: 91116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone: (905) 664-9992
Fax: 9056649910
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE DOMINICA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2014