Fernandez Carreno, Alfonso Jose (CPSO#: 91668)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2011