Fernandez, Peter Giles (CPSO#: 23983)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 25 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records from the practice located at Suite 2, 68 St Paul Street West, St. Catharines, ON L2S 2C5, are stored with Records Management Ltd. Patients please inquire at: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca, or Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3.
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1974
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 25 Oct 2017