Fernando, Waduge Dharshika Nelun (CPSO#: 91244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview North Medical Centre
Unit 6
446 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 7Z9
Phone: (905) 751-1642
Fax: (905) 751-0385
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waduge D. Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fernando ( CPSO# 91244 )

Business Address:
Bayview North Medical Centre
Unit 6
446 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 7Z9
Phone Number: (905) 751-1642

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADUGE DHARSHIKA NELUN FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011