Feroze, Nicholas Gordon Pervez (CPSO#: 96873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Feroze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Feroze ( CPSO# 96873 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS GORDON PERVEZ FEROZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEROZE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012