Ferracuti, Stephen Augustine (CPSO#: 58446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Highlands Health Service
7199 Gelert Rd
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1392
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, Ontario
K9J 7C6
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Gammon & S. Ferracuti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferracuti ( CPSO# 58446 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN AUGUSTINE FERRACUTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRACUTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988