Ferreira, Ivone Martins (CPSO#: 73366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 220 B
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 966-2525
Fax: (416) 944-2525
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital - UHN
Asthma and Airways Center
399 Bathurst , 7 th floor E
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416 6035499
Fax: 416 603 3456
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVONE MARTINS FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008