Ferreira, Nelson De Brito (CPSO#: 64072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5980
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nelson Ferreira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ferreira ( CPSO# 64072 )

Business Address:
Medcan
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NELSON DE BRITO FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992