Ferreria, Sharon Grace (CPSO#: 95516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4S 6N6
Phone: (519) 421-4223
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. G. Ferreria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferreria ( CPSO# 95516 )

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4S 6N6
Phone Number: (519) 421-4223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON GRACE FERRERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRERIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016