Ferri, Mauricio Beller (CPSO#: 85222)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2009