Ferri, Raymond Michael (CPSO#: 33462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 6144
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND MICHAEL FERRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982