Fida, Abdulkareem Rida (CPSO#: 91298)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2010 to 13 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 2010 to 22 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 2011