Fiel, Naiema M (CPSO#: 72963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-9090
Fax: (905) 873-9363
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAIEMA M FIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 28 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2013