Fienberg, Samantha Joy (CPSO#: 91474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chicago, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Fienberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fienberg ( CPSO# 91474 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Radiology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JOY FIENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009