Figueroa, Luis (CPSO#: 91739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Figueroa Gallaga, Luis Leovigildo (used until: 01 Mar 2015 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 742-2961
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Figueroa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Figueroa ( CPSO# 91739 )

Business Address:
401 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 742-2961

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS FIGUEROA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGUEROA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2009
PEAP - Resident - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016