Figurado, Priya Noeline (CPSO#: 96003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: 613-761-5360
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

343 Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Canada
Phone: 613-233-3030
Fax: 613-233-1061
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 6132533803
Fax: 6132575197
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Room 3316
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240 Ext. 3118
Fax: 613-9385379
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA NOELINE FIGURADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGURADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017