Filter, Emily Rose (CPSO#: 86433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QEII HSC (VG Site)
Department Of Pathology
5788 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3H 1V8
Phone: (902) 473-1510

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY ROSE FILTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013