Finan, Emer Antoinette (CPSO#: 83330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room 19-231J
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7346
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Jan 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Emer  Antoinette  Finan  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  neonatal-perinatal medicine.