Finch, Graham Charles (CPSO#: 20709)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa ON
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017