Finch, Susan Jane (CPSO#: 75912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Island Hospital, Campbell Riv
375 2nd Ave,
Campbell River BC  V9W 3V1
Phone: (613) 453-7859
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan J. Finch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Finch ( CPSO# 75912 )

Business Address:
North Island Hospital
375 2nd Avenue
Campbell River BC  V9W 3V1

Medical Records Location

Address: 1. Hotel Dieu Hospital 166 Brock Street Kingston, ON K7L 5G2 Tel: 613-544-3400 2. Street Health Centre - KCHC 235 Wellington St Kingston, ON K7K 0B5 3. Weeneebayko General Hospital 19 Hospital Dr Moose Factory, ON P0L 1W0
Instructions: Patients may contact the facility where they were seen by Dr. Finch to obtain their medical records.
Date Received: 18 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JANE FINCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2001