Fingerote, Robert Joel (CPSO#: 43860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 780-9562
Fax: (905) 237-4516
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Fingerote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fingerote ( CPSO# 43860 )

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-9562

Business Address:
MacKenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOEL FINGEROTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINGEROTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Fingerote’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that during medical appointment(s), Dr. Fingerote sexually abused a patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including: in his behaviour and/or remarks, including by staring at her in an inappropriate and/or sexual manner, asking her to remove or displace clothing for an improper purpose and/or making inappropriate remarks and/or remarks of a sexual nature to her; and by touching her body, including her breasts, in a manner that was inappropriate and/or sexual.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): June 10-14, 2019