Finkelstein, Yaron (CPSO#: 80615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div Paediatric Emergency Med
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5317
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2004 to 14 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 20 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Yaron Finkelstein may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Finkelstein  holds  a  geographical  full-time teaching or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching  or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when  Dr. Finkelstein no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.