Finner, Kevin Patrick (CPSO#: 105995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thiunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK FINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018