Fischbacher, Theodore (CPSO#: 42269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Fax: (705) 435-8867
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Canada
Phone: 4167634191
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fischbacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE FISCHBACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHBACHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2007