Fischer, Lisa Marie Guylaine (CPSO#: 86253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room EM 206
Box 227
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Palliative Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Room 5235
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8940
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Marie Guylaine Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fischer ( CPSO# 86253 )

Business Address:
Dempartment of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room EM 206, Box 227
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Bruyere Hospital
Room 284-J
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE GUYLAINE FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2008 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 02 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2012 to 15 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2014