Fischtein, Danit (CPSO#: 93657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2016

Expiry Date:  31 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellmedica Medical Centre
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wellmedica Medical Centre
90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A6
Canada
Phone: (416) 883-3877
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Danit  Fischtein  may  practise  family medicine with the Wellmedica
                  Medical  Centres  in  Woodbridge  and  Brampton,   Ontario,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  three  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Fischtein's eligibility to take the
                  College of Family Physicians of  Canada  examination  expires,  whichever
                  comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Fischtein's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide the required  reports  to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Fischtein's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June  1, 2016, and will expire on or before
                  May 31, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.