Fisher, Susan Catherine (CPSO#: 56939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eveleigh Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Eveleigh ( CPSO# 57001 )
Dr. S. Fisher ( CPSO# 56939 )

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN CATHERINE FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Oct 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1988