Fitt, Nicole Suzanne (CPSO#: 67975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Memory Program
Elisabeth-Bruyere Hospital
Suite 265Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: 613-562-6013
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laurie ( CPSO# 67964 )
Dr. N. Fitt ( CPSO# 67975 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Business Address:
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE SUZANNE FITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1999