Flamand, Francois Jean (CPSO#: 62734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone: (519) 624-0077
Fax: (519) 624-4800
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francois Flamand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )

Business Address:
201 - 745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 624-0077


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flamand Kolyn Lee Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 64970 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS JEAN FLAMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAMAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991