Flamer, David Richard (CPSO#: 91117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Avenue
19th floor - Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586 5270
Fax: 416 586 8664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 Eglinton Avenue W
Toronto ON  M5N1E3
Canada
Phone: 4167892449
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Avenue
Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5270
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Flamer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Flamer ( CPSO# 91117 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
19th Floor Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
3EN-464
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
100 - 801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD FLAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014