Flanagan, Amanda Nicole (CPSO#: 88891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Nicole Flanagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017


Corporation Name: Luke Thomas Lavallee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Flanagan ( CPSO# 88891 )
Dr. L. Lavallee ( CPSO# 88978 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Urology
501 Smyth Road Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA NICOLE FLANAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLANAGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011