Fleming, Rachel Pollard (CPSO#: 93658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5608
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6400 Ext. 4544
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 8751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Rachel Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fleming ( CPSO# 93658 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Rachel Pollard Fleming may practise medicine independently in
                  Diagnostic Radiology, only.