Flindall, Stephen Alexander (CPSO#: 76914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 4126
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Ave
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5054
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen A. Flindall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Flindall ( CPSO# 76914 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ALEXANDER FLINDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLINDALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2001 to 22 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003