Floh, Alejandro Abraham (CPSO#: 76418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Critical Care Unit
The Hospital for Sick Childre
555 University Avenue, 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228382
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRO ABRAHAM FLOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005