Florendo-Cumbermack, Anita Gonsalvez (CPSO#: 91226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road Room
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3129
Fax: (519) 663-3107
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Florendo-Cumbermack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Florendo-Cumbermack ( CPSO# 91226 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA GONSALVEZ FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016