Florescu, Ana (CPSO#: 90784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
now called Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Florescu ( CPSO# 90784 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA FLORESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 05 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014