Foerster, Christopher Robert (CPSO#: 109829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:James Cook University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District
Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBERT FOERSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOERSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018