Fogolin, Jane Velia (CPSO#: 70070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 8C5
Canada
Phone: 8073434300 Ext. 4363
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE VELIA FOGOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGOLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001