Foley, Karen Anne (CPSO#: 94715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room EN3 437
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Foley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Foley ( CPSO# 94715 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room EN3 437
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3567

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4545

Business Address:
4 - 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H6
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANNE FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 05 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016