Fong, Crystal (CPSO#: 93560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WH X-Ray and Ultrasound
Suite 218
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Canada
Phone: (905) 572-6868
Fax: (905) 572-6860
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Fong & Eric Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cole ( CPSO# 93772 )
Dr. C. Fong ( CPSO# 93560 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017