Fong, Jeremy King-Heng (CPSO#: 97724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4046 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 2W7
Canada
Phone: 905-569-0004
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy K. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong ( CPSO# 97724 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Business Address:
4046 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 2W7
Phone Number: (905) 569-0004

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY KING-HENG FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015